WWF World Heavyweight Title History
Nov 4, 2011 18:25:53 GMT -7
Post by Deleted on Nov 4, 2011 18:25:53 GMT -7
Buddy Rogers
April 29, 1963 Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
Bruno Sammartino
May 17, 1963 New York, NY
Ivan Koloff
January 18, 1971 New York, NY
Pedro Morales
February 8, 1971 New York, NY
Stan Stasiak
December 1, 1973
Bruno Sammartino
December 10, 1973 New York, NY
Billy Graham
April 30, 1977 Baltimore, MD
Bob Backlund
February 20, 1978 New York, NY
Antonio Inoki
November 30, 1979 Tokushima, Japan
Bob Backlund
November 23, 1981 New York, NY
The Iron Sheik
December 26, 1983 New York, NY
Hulk Hogan
January 23, 1984 New York, NY
André the Giant
February 5, 1988 Indianapolis, IN The Main Event I [20]
Vacated — February 5, 1988 — Indianapolis, IN The Main Event I Immediately after winning the title from Hogan, André sold the title to Ted DiBiase; President Jack Tunney nullified this decision, and vacated the title. [20]
Randy Savage
March 27, 1988 Atlantic City, NJ
Hulk Hogan
April 2, 1989 Atlantic City, NJ
The Ultimate Warrior
April 1, 1990 Toronto, ON WrestleMania VI
Sgt. Slaughter
January 19, 1991 Miami, FL
Hulk Hogan
March 24, 1991 Los Angeles, CA
The Undertaker
November 27, 1991 Detroit, MI
Hulk Hogan
December 3, 1991 San Antonio, TX
Vacated
December 4, 1991 — N/A Superstars Hogan was stripped of the title by WWF President Jack Tunney due to the controversy surrounding both of the previous title changes. This aired December 7, 1991.
Ric Flair
January 19, 1992 Albany, NY
Randy Savage
April 5, 1992 Indianapolis, IN
Ric Flair
September 1, 1992 Hershey, PA
Bret Hart
October 12, 1992 Saskatoon, SK
Yokozuna
April 4, 1993 Las Vegas, NV
Hulk Hogan
April 4, 1993 Las Vegas, NV
Yokozuna
June 13, 1993 Dayton, OH
Bret Hart
March 20, 1994 New York, NY
Bob Backlund
November 23, 1994 San Antonio, TX
Diesel
November 26, 1994 New York, NY
Bret Hart
November 19, 1995 Landover, MD
Shawn Michaels
March 31, 1996 Anaheim, CA
Sycho Sid
June 17, 1996 New York, NY
Bret Hart
February 16, 1997 Chattanooga, TN
Sycho Sid
February 17, 1997 Nashville, TN
The Undertaker
March 23, 1997 Rosemont, IL
Bret Hart
August 3, 1997 East Rutherford, NJ
Kane
June 28, 1998 Pittsburgh, PA
The Rock
November 15, 1998 St. Louis, MO
Mankind
December 29, 1998 Worcester, MA
The Rock
January 24, 1999 Anaheim, CA
Mankind
January 26, 1999 Tucson, AZ
Bret Hart
February 15, 1999 Birmingham, AL
The Undertaker
May 23, 1999 Kansas City, MO
Mankind
August 22, 1999 Minneapolis, MN
The Rock
June 25, 2000 Boston, MA
Kurt Angle
October 22, 2000 Albany, NY
The Rock
February 25, 2001 Las Vegas, NV
Kurt Angle
April 1, 2001 Houston, TX
April 29, 1963 Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
Bruno Sammartino
May 17, 1963 New York, NY
Ivan Koloff
January 18, 1971 New York, NY
Pedro Morales
February 8, 1971 New York, NY
Stan Stasiak
December 1, 1973
Bruno Sammartino
December 10, 1973 New York, NY
Billy Graham
April 30, 1977 Baltimore, MD
Bob Backlund
February 20, 1978 New York, NY
Antonio Inoki
November 30, 1979 Tokushima, Japan
Bob Backlund
November 23, 1981 New York, NY
The Iron Sheik
December 26, 1983 New York, NY
Hulk Hogan
January 23, 1984 New York, NY
André the Giant
February 5, 1988 Indianapolis, IN The Main Event I [20]
Vacated — February 5, 1988 — Indianapolis, IN The Main Event I Immediately after winning the title from Hogan, André sold the title to Ted DiBiase; President Jack Tunney nullified this decision, and vacated the title. [20]
Randy Savage
March 27, 1988 Atlantic City, NJ
Hulk Hogan
April 2, 1989 Atlantic City, NJ
The Ultimate Warrior
April 1, 1990 Toronto, ON WrestleMania VI
Sgt. Slaughter
January 19, 1991 Miami, FL
Hulk Hogan
March 24, 1991 Los Angeles, CA
The Undertaker
November 27, 1991 Detroit, MI
Hulk Hogan
December 3, 1991 San Antonio, TX
Vacated
December 4, 1991 — N/A Superstars Hogan was stripped of the title by WWF President Jack Tunney due to the controversy surrounding both of the previous title changes. This aired December 7, 1991.
Ric Flair
January 19, 1992 Albany, NY
Randy Savage
April 5, 1992 Indianapolis, IN
Ric Flair
September 1, 1992 Hershey, PA
Bret Hart
October 12, 1992 Saskatoon, SK
Yokozuna
April 4, 1993 Las Vegas, NV
Hulk Hogan
April 4, 1993 Las Vegas, NV
Yokozuna
June 13, 1993 Dayton, OH
Bret Hart
March 20, 1994 New York, NY
Bob Backlund
November 23, 1994 San Antonio, TX
Diesel
November 26, 1994 New York, NY
Bret Hart
November 19, 1995 Landover, MD
Shawn Michaels
March 31, 1996 Anaheim, CA
Sycho Sid
June 17, 1996 New York, NY
Bret Hart
February 16, 1997 Chattanooga, TN
Sycho Sid
February 17, 1997 Nashville, TN
The Undertaker
March 23, 1997 Rosemont, IL
Bret Hart
August 3, 1997 East Rutherford, NJ
Kane
June 28, 1998 Pittsburgh, PA
The Rock
November 15, 1998 St. Louis, MO
Mankind
December 29, 1998 Worcester, MA
The Rock
January 24, 1999 Anaheim, CA
Mankind
January 26, 1999 Tucson, AZ
Bret Hart
February 15, 1999 Birmingham, AL
The Undertaker
May 23, 1999 Kansas City, MO
Mankind
August 22, 1999 Minneapolis, MN
The Rock
June 25, 2000 Boston, MA
Kurt Angle
October 22, 2000 Albany, NY
The Rock
February 25, 2001 Las Vegas, NV
Kurt Angle
April 1, 2001 Houston, TX